Flowr corp board of directors
WebDec 23, 2024 · The Flowr Corporation FLWR FLWPF recently revealed that Jörg Cieslok has resigned from the board of directors in order to pursue other opportunities. The company wished him all the best in his ... WebApr 29, 2024 · The Flowr Corporation announced changes to its Board of Directors and the addition of Thierry Elmaleh, as Head of Capital Markets. Current Board member Rishi Shah has stepped down as Lead Independent... February 16, 2024
Flowr corp board of directors
Did you know?
WebBoard of Directors Tom Flow , Director Globally recognized for his cannabis thought leadership, Tom Flow is an expert at building and operating cannabis cultivation facilities. WebDec 24, 2024 · “The Company would like to thank Karen Basian, Pauric Duffy, Dr. Lyle Oberg and David Miller for all of their hard work and dedication as members of our Board of Directors since the Company’s founding and who have been instrumental in helping Flowr become the global cannabis company it is today,” commented Steve Klein, Chairman …
WebAug 6, 2024 · The Flowr Corporation announced that Ryan Roebuck has joined the Board of Directors of the Company effective immediately. Mr. Roebuck is the co-founder and CEO of Edition X, which owns and operates cannabis retail stores and branded products and accessories in Canada and California. WebAug 6, 2024 · TORONTO, Aug. 06, 2024 (GLOBE NEWSWIRE) -- The Flowr Corporation (TSX.V: FLWR; OTC: FLWPF) (“Flowr” or the “Company”) is pleased to announce that …
WebAug 6, 2024 · TORONTO, Aug. 06, 2024 (GLOBE NEWSWIRE) -- The Flowr Corporation (TSX.V: FLWR; OTC: FLWPF) (“Flowr” or the “Company”) is pleased to announce that … WebDec 24, 2024 · Highlights: * The Company has closed its strategic acquisition of Terrace Global, creating an entity with a strong balance sheet and global footprint. * The Board of Directors and shareholder base now includes former founders of MedReleaf Corp., ICC Labs Inc. and Bedrocan Canada Inc. * Simultaneously, through liability management, the …
WebAug 13, 2024 · The Flowr Corp. Taps Ryan Roebuck To Serve On The Board. Cannabis company The Flowr Corporation FLWR FLWPF announced recently that Ryan Roebuck will join its board of directors.. Roebuck is the co ...
WebFormerly Guest Professor, Innovation, CEIBS, Zurich; Chief Corporate Officer, Holigen Global Health, and Member of the Board of Flowr Corporation in Canada; Board director of ProLogis, a major NYSE listed US corporation in Denver, CO, Board director of EskoArtwork in Denmark/Belgium, and Chairman of the Board of the International … small propane cylinder valve removal toolhighline assisted livingWebAug 10, 2024 · TORONTO, Aug. 10, 2024 (GLOBE NEWSWIRE) -- The Flowr Corporation (TSX.V: FLWR; OTC: FLWPF) (“Flowr” or the “Company”) today announced leadership and governance changes with the appointments of Darren Karasiuk to the role of Chief Executive Officer … highline area food bankWebAug 10, 2024 · Tom Flow, who has acted as Interim CEO of Flowr since March, remains on the Board along-side incumbents Joanne Lee and Ryan Roebuck. Darren Karasiuk, CEO … highline arlington vaWebDec 16, 2024 · The Flowr Corporation announced that Jörg Cieslok has resigned from the Board of Directors in order to pursue other opportunities. February 19, 2024 highline asphaltWebSep 10, 2024 · TORONTO, Sept. 10, 2024 (GLOBE NEWSWIRE) -- The Flowr Corporation (TSX.V: FLWR; OTC: FLWPF) (“Flowr” or the “Company”) announced today that Vince Gasparro has resigned from the Board of ... highline architectWebAug 6, 2024 · TORONTO, Aug. 06, 2024 (GLOBE NEWSWIRE) -- The Flowr Corporation (TSX.V: FLWR; OTC: FLWPF) (“Flowr” or the “Company”) is pleased to announce that Ryan Roebuck has joined the Board of Directors of the Company effective immediately.Mr. Roebuck is the … small propane bottles for grills